06/23/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/27/2010 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
05/13/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/13/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5132.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |||
04/21/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |||
03/11/2010 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |