California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2483 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 3, 2010
Bill July 15, 2010
Bill June 28, 2010
Bill June 16, 2010
Bill May 19, 2010
Bill May 3, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010
Bill March 22, 2010