|
08/18/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 154, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 6009.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4197.)
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 22).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 23).
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|