|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4670.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5388.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 42. Noes 20. Page 5347.).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
03/22/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|