|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 265, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 54. Noes 22. Page 6588.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4788.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 5392.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 17. Noes 1.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|