|
06/30/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 6. Page 5045.)
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 3).
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4927.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4927.)
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|