LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB25
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB25
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB25
Compare Versions
AB25 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB25 Amended August 9, 2010
AB25 Amended July 15, 2010
AB25 Amended January 13, 2010
AB25 Amended April 2, 2009
AB25 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
AB25 Enrolled September 3, 2010
AB25 Amended August 9, 2010
AB25 Amended July 15, 2010
AB25 Amended January 13, 2010
AB25 Amended April 2, 2009
AB25 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare