|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 424, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5:15 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1914.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1550.)
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|