05/11/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/10/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/04/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 28). | |||
04/27/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/06/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
03/25/2010 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |