|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 687, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/15/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 68. Noes 2. Page 6927.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 4863.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 23.)
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. (Corrected July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5477.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. (Corrected June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. (Corrected April 12.)
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|