04/12/2010 | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on W.,P. & W. and NAT. RES. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 12). | |||
04/08/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES by unanimous consent. | |||
04/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |