|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 390, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6558.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6589.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4785.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to JR 61(b)(14).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5242.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4972.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|