|
08/30/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Price.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 4959.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From inactive file. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Price.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5143.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|