LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB251
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill AB251
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB251
Action History
05/20/2009
From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
04/23/2009
In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage.
03/09/2009
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
02/11/2009
From printer. May be heard in committee March 13.
02/10/2009
Read first time. To print.