LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2514
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2514
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2514
Compare Versions
AB2514 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2514 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2514 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2514 Amended June 21, 2010
AB2514 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 28, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 7, 2010
AB2514 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2514 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2514 Enrolled September 8, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 17, 2010
AB2514 Amended August 2, 2010
AB2514 Amended July 15, 2010
AB2514 Amended June 21, 2010
AB2514 Amended May 28, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 28, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 14, 2010
AB2514 Amended April 7, 2010
AB2514 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare