05/28/2010 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/19/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (May 4). | |||
04/28/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/27/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |