California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2523 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 21, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010
Bill April 5, 2010