05/03/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/19/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/05/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
03/25/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |