|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 18. Page 5585.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|