06/01/2010 | To inactive file on motion of Assembly Member Bill Berryhill. | |||
05/05/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/04/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |||
04/20/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/13/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/12/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |