|
08/05/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. To inactive file on motion of Senator Padilla.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5127.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5025.).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|