California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill June 1, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010