LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2541
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2541
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2541
Compare Versions
AB2541 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2541 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB2541 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2541 Amended June 24, 2010
AB2541 Amended April 28, 2010
AB2541 Amended April 13, 2010
AB2541 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
AB2541 Chaptered September 29, 2010
AB2541 Enrolled September 13, 2010
AB2541 Amended August 20, 2010
AB2541 Amended June 24, 2010
AB2541 Amended April 28, 2010
AB2541 Amended April 13, 2010
AB2541 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare