|
08/31/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5161.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|