|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5028.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12). Received August 13 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(b)(14)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 11).
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5392.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|