|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 602, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 6787.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
From committee: With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (August 25).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4670.)
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 28. Page 5422.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|