|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 16).
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5505.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|