|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 29).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 5489.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 5).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|