|
11/30/2010
|
From Senate committee without further action.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 5555.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|