California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2582 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill July 2, 2010

Chaptered

Bill July 15, 2010

Amended

Bill May 5, 2010
Bill March 25, 2010