California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Amended

Bill August 4, 2010
Bill May 28, 2010
Bill April 27, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010