|
08/30/2010
|
To inactive file on motion of Senator Kehoe.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 5.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 28).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. Re-referred. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 15).
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on F. & A. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 1. Page 5289.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 13).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and AGRI. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|