California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2596 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 19, 2010
Bill June 17, 2010