|
09/29/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6877.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 7. Page 4937.)
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 5549.) Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 4. Page 5576.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Page 5447.).
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 19).
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 19).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|