|
08/12/2010
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 29). Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
Referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 29. Page 5138.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 12).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|