|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 267, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 56. Noes 20. Page 6782.)
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6707.)
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4876.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (August 12).
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
In committee: Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (August 4).
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Senate. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5582.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4).
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|