|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Ordered returned to Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4860.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 5034.)
|
|
|
|
04/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (April 28).
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|