|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
10/26/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2601.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1765.)
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (July 7).
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 974.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 31).
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 18).
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|