California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2610 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 07/15/2010

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2610CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 100 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE JULY 15, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR JULY 15, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE JULY 1, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY MAY 6, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Niello FEBRUARY 19, 2010 An act to amend Section 8754 of the Government Code, relating to state government. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2610, Niello. Arts Council: officers and employees. Existing law, the Dixon-Zenovich-Maddy California Arts Act of 1975, establishes an Arts Council that has specified duties related to the arts. Existing law requires the Governor to appoint a director and 2 deputies for the council and authorizes the council to delegate certain responsibilities to the director. This bill would require that the council select the director. This bill would make the director responsible for, among other things, hiring council staff. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8754 of the Government Code is amended to read: 8754. The council shall select a director for the Arts Council. The council may delegate to the director the responsibilities for carrying out council policy. The director shall assist the council in the carrying out of its work, be responsible for the hiring of council staff, including, but not limited to, deputy directors, be responsible for the management and administration of the council staff, and perform other duties as directed by the council.