California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2612 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2010

Amended

Bill June 16, 2010
Bill June 7, 2010
Bill April 7, 2010