11/30/2010 | From Senate committee without further action. | |||
05/20/2010 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
05/06/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 5029.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |||
04/14/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (April 13). | |||
04/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
04/06/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |