|
07/06/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 44, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 4:50 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 3946.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (June 10).
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 4823.)
|
|
|
|
04/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 14).
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|