|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 227, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 1. Page 3259.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3152.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 10 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2172.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Corrected September 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
In committee: Placed on Appropriations suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 15. Page 1990.)
|
|
|
|
05/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 28). Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (April 27).
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|