06/24/2010 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/10/2010 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
06/07/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
06/03/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 5569.) | |||
05/24/2010 | Read third time, amended, and returned to third reading. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 5280.). | |||
05/20/2010 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
05/19/2010 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 19). | |||
04/20/2010 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 19). | |||
03/18/2010 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |