|
01/14/2010
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2702.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 18 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1764.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (July 8).
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1241.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (April 22).
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 1).
|
|
|
|
03/04/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|