|
06/22/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5343.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 19).
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 5).
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|