|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/30/2009
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
In Assembly. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1521.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
Ordered to Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1369.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (May 5).
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/12/2009
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 14.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2009
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|