06/07/2010 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
06/03/2010 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/20/2010 | Referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
05/06/2010 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/06/2010 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5051.) | |||
05/03/2010 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
04/29/2010 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 28). | |||
04/20/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/19/2010 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/15/2010 | From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 13). | |||
02/22/2010 | Read first time. | |||
02/21/2010 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |||
02/19/2010 | Introduced. To print. |