|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled and to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6562.) Senate amendments concurred in. To enrollment. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6592.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4791.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time, amended. To second reading. (Corrected August 26.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. (Corrected June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 24. Page 4857.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (April 21).
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 6).
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|