|
06/21/2010
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
Referred to Coms. on ED. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 27. Page 5280.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2010
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 12).
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Amend, do pass as amended, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/22/2010
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|